This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 04:19:26 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST VS CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JILL FEENEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9808

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

CASTELLANOS ADAN MENDOZA

Defendants

CRST LINCOLN SALES INC.

DANIELS ROBERT

DANIELS ROBERT TILDEN SEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOY MATTHEW KEVIN ESQ.

LLOYD PRISCILLA ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MOTU MITCHELL C. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/13/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/13/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/13/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/13/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/13/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

3/1/2023: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RE: 22STCV29808 AND 23LBCV00018

3/3/2023: Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE RE: 22STCV29808 AND 23LBCV00018

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES

3/10/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES; THE COURT HAS REVIEWED AND C...) OF 03/16/2023

3/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES; THE COURT HAS REVIEWED AND C...) OF 03/16/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES; THE COURT HAS REVIEWED AND C...)

3/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RELATED CASES; THE COURT HAS REVIEWED AND C...)

Notice of Ruling

3/22/2023: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER PROPOSED

5/1/2023: Order - ORDER PROPOSED

Notice of Ruling

5/5/2023: Notice of Ruling

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2024
  • Hearing09/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2024
  • Hearing03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2024
  • Hearing02/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as to Defendants Robert Daniels and Robert Tilden Sean Daniels

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOrder Proposed; Signed and Filed by: CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as to Defendants Robert Daniels and Robert Tilden Sean Daniels scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV29808, and 23LBCV00018 consolidated; case number 22STCV29808 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order to Consolidate Related Cases: Filed By: CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC. (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 03/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST (Plaintiff); As to: CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC. (Defendant); ROBERT DANIELS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST (Plaintiff); As to: CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC. (Defendant); ROBERT DANIELS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less