This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 15:51:05 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST VS BMC WEST, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BMC WEST, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6159

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Defendant

BMC WEST LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRIS JOHN SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2024
  • Hearing09/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMC WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRIS JOHN SCOTT