This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 17:52:38 (UTC).

INSOO SITES VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 INSOO SITES filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON, JR., WILLIAM F. FAHEY and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3928

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

SITES INSOO

INSOO SITES

Defendants and Respondents

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL

DOES 1 TO 10

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

YANG REY S. ESQ.

YANG PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

YANG REY SHUNG

YANG REY SHUNG ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

9/24/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO THE OPE...)

9/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO THE OPE...)

Case Management Statement

3/11/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/12/2020: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESP...) OF 03/26/2020

3/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESP...) OF 03/26/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESP...)

3/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESP...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS)

4/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS) OF 04/03/2020

4/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARINGS) OF 04/03/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF REY S. YANG RE: CASE STATUS AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION

6/16/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF REY S. YANG RE: CASE STATUS AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/16/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

6/16/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESP...)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESP...)

Notice - NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS, KAISER FOUNDATION OF CONTINUANCE OF CMC/TRIAL SETTING/OSC HEARING

7/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS, KAISER FOUNDATION OF CONTINUANCE OF CMC/TRIAL SETTING/OSC HEARING

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESP...) OF 07/28/2020

7/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ANSWER/RESP...) OF 07/28/2020

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

8/7/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • Docketat 3:18 PM in Department C; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketReport of Action Taken On Remittitur; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B308661); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 2 Volumes Certified NOA 10/30/20; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 10/30/20 B308661); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNtc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Insoo Sites (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
259 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: CIVIL RIGHTS ACT AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT (ADA); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by INSOO SITES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by INSOO SITES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by INSOO SITES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by INSOO SITES (Plaintiff); Insoo Sites (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Insoo Sites (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693928    Hearing Date: October 29, 2020    Dept: C

SITES v. KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.

CASE NO.: BC693928

HEARING: 10/29/2020

#12

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff INSOO SITES’ (in pro per) Motion for Reconsideration to Revoke Order Sustaining Demurrer and Motion to Strike is DENIED. CCP §1008.

Opposing Party to give Notice.

Plaintiff’s motion for reconsideration of this Court’s November 16, 2018 Order is DENIED.

“When an application for an order has been made to a judge, or to a court, and refused in whole or in part, or granted, or granted conditionally, or on terms, any party affected by the order may, within 10 days after service upon the party of written notice of entry of the order and based upon new or different facts, circumstances, or law, make application to the same judge or court that made the order, to reconsider the matter and modify, amend, or revoke the prior order.” (emphasis added.) (CCP §1008(a).)

The undisputed facts are as follows: Plaintiff seeks reconsideration of the Court’s November 16, 2018 Order. Defendants served Notice of said Order on or about November 28, 2018. The instant Motion was not filed until August 17, 2020—almost two years after Notice was served. Plaintiff’s Motion is untimely and must be denied on procedural grounds.

Moreover, Plaintiff’s Motion would also properly be denied on the merits where Plaintiff has failed to offer new or different facts, circumstances or law to justify reconsideration of the November 2018 Order.

The Court notes that Plaintiff does not request that this Court set aside the July 29, 2020 Judgment pursuant to CCP §473(b).

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YANG REY SHUNG