This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2022 at 16:23:42 (UTC).

INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AS ASSIGNEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CREDITORS OF TREND OFFSET PRINTING VS ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC., AN INDIANA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AS ASSIGNEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CREDITORS OF TREND OFFSET PRINTING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC , AN INDIANA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0111

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AS ASSIGNEE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CREDITORS OF TREND OFFSET PRINTING SERVICES INC.

Defendant

ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES INC. AN INDIANA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOLUBOW RICHARD HOWARD

ROWLES TAMARA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/20/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT

5/10/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

7/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

8/1/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

7/29/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEASE TO THE COMPLAINT

7/9/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEASE TO THE COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/01/2022

DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, as assignee for the benefit of creditors of Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc., (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, as assignee for the benefit of creditors of Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc., (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, H. Jay Ford III, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2022

DocketStipulation and Order Extending Deadline for the Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Please to the Complaint; Filed by INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, as assignee for the benefit of creditors of Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc., (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2022

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, as assignee for the benefit of creditors of Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc., (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2022

DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline for the Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint); Filed by INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, as assignee for the benefit of creditors of Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc., (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, as assignee for the benefit of creditors of Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc., (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2022

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, as assignee for the benefit of creditors of Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc., (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, as assignee for the benefit of creditors of Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc., (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, as assignee for the benefit of creditors of Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc., (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2022

DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by INSOLVENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., a California corporation, as assignee for the benefit of creditors of Trend Offset Printing Services, Inc., (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less