This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 19:44:44 (UTC).

INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION VS JULANDER BROWN BOLLARD, LLP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against JULANDER BROWN BOLLARD, LLP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0863

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION

Defendants

TABOADA ROCHLIN GOVIER LLP

TABOADA FRANK J. ESQ

JULANDER DIRK O. ESQ

JULANDER BROWN BOLLARD LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AKTHER FARHANA

REEDER CHRISTOPHER S.

TRAGISH BENJAMIN S.

Defendant Attorneys

CURTIS-IVES COURTNEY

WAXLER ANDREW J.

 

Court Documents

Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

2/2/2021: Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD - ORANGE COUNTY CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER- 30-202101187013

3/9/2021: RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD - ORANGE COUNTY CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER- 30-202101187013

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

2/2/2021: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Receipt for Transmitted Record

2/2/2021: Receipt for Transmitted Record

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/20/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE)

1/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

1/22/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/4/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. LAUTER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANG

1/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN D. LAUTER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANG

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/6/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Judicial Notice

1/6/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MAZIAR FARZAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

1/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MAZIAR FARZAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN S. TRAGISH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF O

1/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN S. TRAGISH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF O

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

1/6/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF INHANCE DIGITAL CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, DECLARATIONS, AND EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

1/12/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, DECLARATIONS, AND EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

1/12/2021: Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DIRK JULANDER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE

12/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DIRK JULANDER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketReturned Receipt for Transmitted Record - Orange County Central Justice Center- 30-202101187013; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re payment of transfer fees- paid) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Documents; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (**off/cal, parties served**) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE: MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE); Filed by Julander Brown Bollard, LLP (Defendant); Dirk O. Julander, Esq (Defendant); Taboada Rochlin Govier LLP (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Inhance Digital Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Inhance Digital Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Inhance Digital Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Inhance Digital Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Inhance Digital Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Inhance Digital Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Inhance Digital Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0863    Hearing Date: January 20, 2021    Dept: 52

DEFENDANTS JULANDER BROWN BOLLARD, LLP; DIRK JULANDER, ESQ.; TABOADA ROCHLIN GOVIER LLP; AND FRANK J. TABOADA, ESQ,’S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT, COUNTY OF ORANGE

The court having read the papers and heard the arguments rules as follows:

Requests for Judicial Notice

Plaintiff requests judicial notice of:

1. The online court docket of Inhance Digital Corporation, v. Maziar Farzam, Los Angeles Superior Court Case No. 19STCV13924; and

2. The indictment filed on October 10, 2019 in United States of America v. Brandon Becker, U.S District Court, Southern District of New York, Case No. 1:19-cr00704-LAP as Document No. 7.

Both documents are court records subject to judicial notice. (Evid. Code, ; 452(d).) The requests are GRANTED.

Venue

CCP ; 397(a) provides that courts may transfer a case to another venue when the present venue is not proper. CCP ; 395(a) provides, “Except as otherwise provided by law and subject to the power of the court to transfer actions or proceedings as provided in this title, the superior court in the county where the defendants or some of them reside at the commencement of the action is the proper court for the trial of the action.”

Gallin v. Superior Court

The plaintiff's theory of the action as set forth in the complaint determines the venue. Because the law favors the right of trial at the defendant's residence, the complaint will be strictly construed against a plaintiff seeking to lay the venue elsewhere. 

A “mixed action” is one where the plaintiff has alleged two or more causes of action, each of which is governed by a different venue statute. Or, two or more defendants are named who are subject to different venue standards. Where the defendant is entitled to a change of venue as to one cause of action, the entire action is transferred. 

(Citations omitted; see also 3 Witkin, Cal. Proc. 5th Actions ; 885.)

Whether or not this Court is a proper court for the claims for legal malpractice, it is not a proper court for the third cause of action for conversion. “The general rule is that the residence of defendant is the proper place for trial, and this applies to personal torts not involving physical injury, including conversion.” (Haurat v. Superior Court for Los Angeles County (1966) 241 Cal.App.2d 330, 333.)

Plaintiff’s third cause of action alleges conversion against defendants Dirk Julander and Julander Brown & Bollard, LLP. Plaintiff alleges that Julander solicited Penn Arthur to wrongfully take $150,000 from plaintiff’s account, which Arthur then paid to Julander. (¶¶ 95-100.)

It is undisputed that defendants Julander Brown Bollard, LLP and Dirk Julander reside in Orange County. (Opposition, 8:13-15.) The proper court for the conversion claim against them is there. They are therefore entitled to a change of venue of the entire action to the Superior Court for the County of Orange. (Gallin, supra, 230 Cal.App.3d 541, 545.)

Transfer Fees

CCP ; 399(a) provides that, when a court orders transfer of a case because it was brought in an improper court, the plaintiff must pay the costs and fees of the transfer.

Based on the foregoing, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the costs and fees of the transfer. This case will then be transferred to Orange County Superior Court in accordance with CCP ; 399.

[Moving party] is ordered to give notice.

If either party do not agree with courts tentative ruling, parties are they are ordered to appear by LACourtConnect at 8:30 a.m., in Department 52.