This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2023 at 09:26:33 (UTC).

INFINIDUS, INC. VS THE HOOK CREATIVE, INC

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 INFINIDUS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE HOOK CREATIVE, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0994

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

INFINIDUS INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

THE HOOK CREATIVE INC. DBA TRIM AKA TRIM AGENCY A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DERBY PAUL B.

SARDARYAN MANE

Defendant Attorneys

KAHN ROBERT SAMUEL

YAKOVLEV ALANA SABINA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/18/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Association of Attorney

11/4/2022: Association of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/24/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

10/20/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/17/2022: Cross-Complaint

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SET ASIDE DEFAULT

10/3/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Answer

10/3/2022: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/16/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

8/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/15/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Infinidus, Inc. on 07/15/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Infinidus, Inc. as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Infinidus, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 09:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 09:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A updated: Result Date to 11/09/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: The Hook Creative, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: The Hook Creative, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to The Hook Creative, Inc. dba TRIM aka Trim Agency; On the Complaint filed by Infinidus, Inc. on 07/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Infinidus, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Hook Creative, Inc. dba TRIM aka Trim Agency (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Infinidus, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Hook Creative, Inc. dba TRIM aka Trim Agency (Defendant); Service Date: 08/04/2022; Service Cost: 250.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Infinidus, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Hook Creative, Inc. dba TRIM aka Trim Agency (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Infinidus, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Hook Creative, Inc. dba TRIM aka Trim Agency (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Infinidus, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Hook Creative, Inc. dba TRIM aka Trim Agency (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less