This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 01:14:33 (UTC).

INDUSTRIAL ASSETS CORP. VS WIMATEX, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2017 INDUSTRIAL ASSETS CORP filed an Other lawsuit against WIMATEX, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6240

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BIDITUP AUCTIONS WORLDWIDE INC.

INDUSTRIAL ASSETS CORP.

SNOGEN CORPORATION

DESIGN BY NATURE LLC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

WIMATEX INC.

SNOGEN CORPORATION

DESIGN BY NATURE LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER BARONDESS LLP

 

Court Documents

Judgment -

8/1/2018: Judgment -

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) -

8/1/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) -

Minute Order -

8/1/2018: Minute Order -

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order -

8/10/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketMemo of Costs; Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department R; Ruling on Submitted Matter - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Defendant/Cross-Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R; Court Order (Court Order; Submitted-On Briefs) -

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by INDUSTRIAL ASSETS, CORP. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketCross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued; Filed by WIMATEX, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketAmended Answer; Filed by WIMATEX, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WIMATEX, INC. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by INDUSTRIAL ASSETS, CORP. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by BIDITUP AUCTIONS WORLDWIDE, INC. (Legacy Party); INDUSTRIAL ASSETS, CORP. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by BIDITUP AUCTIONS WORLDWIDE, INC. (Legacy Party); INDUSTRIAL ASSETS, CORP. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by BIDITUP AUCTIONS WORLDWIDE, INC. (Legacy Party); INDUSTRIAL ASSETS, CORP. (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SNOGEN CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Design by Nature, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WIMATEX INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A WM TEXTILE is a litigant

Latest cases where INDUSTRIAL ASSETS CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BIDITUP AUCTIONS WORLDWIDE INC. is a litigant