This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 03:55:16 (UTC).

INA HILLEBRANDT VS GELSON'S MARKET

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 INA HILLEBRANDT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GELSON'S MARKET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5934

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILLEBRANDT INA

Claimant

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendant

GELSON'S MARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSO ROBERT J

Claimant Attorneys

CHAPA MONICA

MOSTERT-ABBEY NICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2024
  • Hearing07/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Hearing01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • Hearing12/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY AND CONTACT INFORMATION); Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by INA HILLEBRANDT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by INA HILLEBRANDT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by INA HILLEBRANDT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GELSON'S MARKET is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAPA MONICA