This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2021 at 07:30:10 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: . WAGNER

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 IN THE MATTER OF WAGNER was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS C. FALLS and GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0329

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THOMAS C. FALLS

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WAGNER .

WAGNER . AKA DEDRICK DWAYNE WAGNER-JUDKINS

Defendant

: . WAGNER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

7/9/2021: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Petition for Change of Name

7/9/2021: Petition for Change of Name

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/25/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/11/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Publication

10/20/2021: Proof of Publication

Decree Changing Name

10/20/2021: Decree Changing Name

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

10/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Thomas C. Falls, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by . Wagner (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Thomas C. Falls, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by . Wagner (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by . Wagner (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by . Wagner (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by . Wagner (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wagner is a litigant