This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 13:08:41 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE CLAIM OF BROOKLYN DIXON, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, WONDA L. HALE VS CITY OF COMPTON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE CLAIM OF BROOKLYN DIXON, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, WONDA L HALE filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF COMPTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4249

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IN THE MATTER OF THE CLAIM OF BROOKLYN DIXON A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM WONDA L. HALE

Respondents

CITY OF COMPTON

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BLUMENTHAL HOWARD S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE A LATE TORT CLAIM AGAINST GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY [PURSUANT TO GOV. CODE 946.6]

12/30/2021: Petition - PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE A LATE TORT CLAIM AGAINST GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY [PURSUANT TO GOV. CODE 946.6]

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

1/5/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

2/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • Hearing04/06/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 86 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by In the Matter of the Claim of Brooklyn Dixon, a Minor, by and Through Her Guardian Ad Litem, Wonda L. Hale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketPetition (for Permission to File a Late Tort Claim Against Governmental Entity [Pursuant to Gov. Code 946.6]); Filed by In the Matter of the Claim of Brooklyn Dixon, a Minor, by and Through Her Guardian Ad Litem, Wonda L. Hale (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF COMPTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUMETHAL HOWARD S