Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 22:53:10 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: ROXANNE VALENTINE ADLON

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 IN THE MATTER OF ROXANNE VALENTINE ADLON was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0532

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ADLON ROXANNE VALENTINE

ADLON ROXANNE VALENTINE AKA ROCKET VALENTINE SEGALL ADLON

Defendant

: ROXANNE VALENTINE ADLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHARP WENDY C.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 05/03/2021

5/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 05/03/2021

Decree Changing Name

5/3/2021: Decree Changing Name

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

5/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Proof of Publication

4/8/2021: Proof of Publication

Petition for Change of Name

2/18/2021: Petition for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

2/18/2021: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 05/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by Roxanne Valentine Adlon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Roxanne Valentine Adlon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Roxanne Valentine Adlon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Roxanne Valentine Adlon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by Roxanne Valentine Adlon (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 21STCP00532    Hearing Date: May 3, 2021    Dept: 26

NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. The petition is granted. A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHARP WENDY CATHLEEN