Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2021 at 01:06:18 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: MONIQUE MALET YIM

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 IN THE MATTER OF MONIQUE MALET YIM was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0132

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Petitioners

YIM MONIQUE MALET

YIM MONIQUE MALET AKA MONIQUE MALET

Defendant

: MONIQUE MALET YIM

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication

5/7/2021: Proof of Publication

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

5/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Decree Changing Name

5/21/2021: Decree Changing Name

Petition for Change of Name

3/25/2021: Petition for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

3/25/2021: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by Monique Malet Yim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Monique Malet Yim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Monique Malet Yim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Monique Malet Yim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by Monique Malet Yim (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less