This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2020 at 23:29:02 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: MARK ANTHONY GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 IN THE MATTER OF MARK ANTHONY GOMEZ was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0029

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOMEZ MARK ANTHONY

Defendant

: MARK ANTHONY GOMEZ

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication

3/20/2020: Proof of Publication

Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling

4/13/2020: Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition for Change of Name

2/11/2020: Petition for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

2/11/2020: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME (CHANGE OF NAME)]

2/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME (CHANGE OF NAME)]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NAME CHANGE CRIMINAL HISTORY ASSESSMENT]

2/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NAME CHANGE CRIMINAL HISTORY ASSESSMENT]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • Hearing07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Mark Anthony Gomez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Name Change Criminal History Assessment]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mark Anthony Gomez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Mark Anthony Gomez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by Mark Anthony Gomez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.