Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2019 at 13:18:45 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: MAISY VAN LIER KRAEMER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 a Other - Name Change case was filed by IN THE MATTER OF MAISY VAN LIER KRAEMER, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0074

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Petitioners

VAN LIER HEIDI

KRAEMER JOSEPH THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/26/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Application to File Documents Under Seal in Name Change Proceeding Under Address Confidentiality Program (Safe at Home)

11/26/2018: Order on Application to File Documents Under Seal in Name Change Proceeding Under Address Confidentiality Program (Safe at Home)

Unknown

11/26/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/11/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/1/2019: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • Request For Copies; Filed by Maisy Van Lier Kraemer (Petitioner); Heidi Van Lier (Petitioner); Joseph Thomas Kraemer (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reMinor's Name and Gender Change) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Decree Changing Name and Order Recognizing Change of Gender and for Issuance of New Birth Certificate; Filed by Maisy Van Lier Kraemer (Petitioner); Heidi Van Lier (Petitioner); Joseph Thomas Kraemer (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Minor's Name and Gender Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maisy Van Lier Kraemer (Petitioner); Heidi Van Lier (Petitioner); Joseph Thomas Kraemer (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Petition for Change of Name (and Recognition of Minor's Change of Gender and Issuance of Birth Certificate); Filed by Maisy Van Lier Kraemer (Petitioner); Heidi Van Lier (Petitioner); Joseph Thomas Kraemer (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less