Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2021 at 07:30:35 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: KIMBERLY LYN SCHNEIDER

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 IN THE MATTER OF KIMBERLY LYN SCHNEIDER was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHNEIDER KIMBERLY LYN

Defendant

: KIMBERLY LYN SCHNEIDER

 

Court Documents

Decree Changing Name

1/14/2021: Decree Changing Name

Proof of Publication

2/26/2021: Proof of Publication

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE FOR KIMBERLY LYN SCHNEIDER)

2/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE FOR KIMBERLY LYN SCHNEIDER)

Petition for Change of Name - PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FOR KIMBERLY LYN SCHNEIDER

1/14/2021: Petition for Change of Name - PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME FOR KIMBERLY LYN SCHNEIDER

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME (CHANGE OF NAME) FOR KIMBERLY LYN SCHNEIDER

1/14/2021: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME (CHANGE OF NAME) FOR KIMBERLY LYN SCHNEIDER

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change (for Kimberly Lyn Schneider) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change for Kimberly Lyn Schneider)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Kimberly Lyn Schneider (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) (for Kimberly Lyn Schneider); Filed by Kimberly Lyn Schneider (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kimberly Lyn Schneider (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name (for Kimberly Lyn Schneider); Filed by Kimberly Lyn Schneider (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by Kimberly Lyn Schneider (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less