Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2020 at 02:02:44 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: KELLY STACKPOOLE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 IN THE MATTER OF KELLY STACKPOOLE was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0159

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

STACKPOOLE KELLY

STACKPOOLE SEAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING OSC RE: NAME CHANGE FROM 08/07/2020 TO ...)

7/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ADVANCING OSC RE: NAME CHANGE FROM 08/07/2020 TO ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING OSC RE: NAME CHANGE FROM 08/07/2020 TO ...) OF 07/21/2020

7/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING OSC RE: NAME CHANGE FROM 08/07/2020 TO ...) OF 07/21/2020

Decree Changing Name and Order Recognizing Change of Gender and for Issuance of New Birth Certifica - DECREE CHANGING NAME AND ORDER RECOGNIZING CHANGE OF GENDER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF NEW BIRTH CERTIFIC

7/31/2020: Decree Changing Name and Order Recognizing Change of Gender and for Issuance of New Birth Certifica - DECREE CHANGING NAME AND ORDER RECOGNIZING CHANGE OF GENDER AND FOR ISSUANCE OF NEW BIRTH CERTIFIC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

7/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/09/2020

6/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/09/2020

Petition for Change of Name, Recognition of Change of Gender, and Issuance of New Birth Certificate

5/20/2020: Petition for Change of Name, Recognition of Change of Gender, and Issuance of New Birth Certificate

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to Conform to Gender Identity

5/20/2020: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to Conform to Gender Identity

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department K; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department K; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDecree Changing Name and Order Recognizing Change of Gender and for Issuance of New Birth Certificate; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docketat 11:39 AM in Department K; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Advancing OSC Re: Name Change from 08/07/2020 to ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Advancing OSC Re: Name Change from 08/07/2020 to ...) of 07/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department K; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 06/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kelly Stackpoole (Petitioner); Sean Stackpoole (Petitioner); Hailey Rachel Stackpoole (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPetition for Recognition of Minor's Change of Gender and Issuance of New Birth Certificate; Filed by Kelly Stackpoole (Petitioner); Sean Stackpoole (Petitioner); Hailey Rachel Stackpoole (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name to Conform to Gender Identity; Filed by Kelly Stackpoole (Petitioner); Sean Stackpoole (Petitioner); Hailey Rachel Stackpoole (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less