Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2019 at 09:46:20 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: JUSTIN ALBERT MEJIA

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 IN THE MATTER OF JUSTIN ALBERT MEJIA was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4047

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEJIA JUSTIN ALBERT

Defendant

: JUSTIN ALBERT MEJIA

 

Court Documents

Decree Changing Name

11/19/2019: Decree Changing Name

Proof of Publication

10/18/2019: Proof of Publication

Petition for Change of Name

9/19/2019: Petition for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

9/19/2019: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/19/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by Justin Albert Mejia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Justin Albert Mejia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Justin Albert Mejia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by Justin Albert Mejia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Justin Albert Mejia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP04047    Hearing Date: November 19, 2019    Dept: 44

No appearance is necessary. The petition will be GRANTED. Petitioner can obtain a copy of the signed decree one week from 11/19/20 at the certification window in Room 112.