This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2020 at 00:11:41 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: JULIA NICOLE HERRERA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 IN THE MATTER OF JULIA NICOLE HERRERA was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0455

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HERRERA JULIA NICOLE

HERRERA JULIA NICOLE AKA JULIA NICOLE JIMENEZ

Defendant

: JULIA NICOLE HERRERA

 

Court Documents

Decree Changing Name

12/5/2019: Decree Changing Name

Petition for Change of Name

12/5/2019: Petition for Change of Name

Proof of Publication

2/5/2020: Proof of Publication

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

2/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/5/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Julia Nicole Herrera (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Julia Nicole Herrera (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by Julia Nicole Herrera (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by Julia Nicole Herrera (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less