Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:44:36 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF JUAN RALPH THOMPSON (FIELDS)

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 IN THE MATTER OF JUAN RALPH THOMPSON FIELDS was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1721

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DONNA FIELDS GOLDSTEIN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

THOMPSON (FIELDS) JUAN RALPH

THOMPSON FIELDS JUAN RALPH

 

Court Documents

Order on Application to File Documents Under Seal in Name Change Proceeding Under Address Confidentiality Program (Safe at Home)

7/12/2017: Order on Application to File Documents Under Seal in Name Change Proceeding Under Address Confidentiality Program (Safe at Home)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/12/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Unknown

7/12/2017: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

7/19/2017: Unknown

Proof of Publication

8/18/2017: Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication

8/18/2017: Proof of Publication

Unknown

8/18/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

8/25/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

8/25/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/25/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change (Hrng On Petition To Change Name; Petition Granted) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Decree; Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Request For Copies; Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Request For Copies; Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Order to Show Cause; Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Order to Show Cause; Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Petition for Change of Name; Filed by Juan Ralph Thompson (Fields) (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less