Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 01:03:54 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: JOSEPH HONG

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 IN THE MATTER OF JOSEPH HONG was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0827

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HONG JOSEPH

Defendant

: JOSEPH HONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TRAN QUANG VAN

 

Court Documents

Decree Changing Name (Change of Name)

5/29/2019: Decree Changing Name (Change of Name)

Proof of Publication

4/16/2019: Proof of Publication

Unknown

3/19/2019: Unknown

Petition for Change of Gender and Issuance of New Birth Certificate

3/20/2019: Petition for Change of Gender and Issuance of New Birth Certificate

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Application to File Documents Under Seal in Name Change Proceeding Under Address Confidentiality Program (Safe at Home)

3/20/2019: Order on Application to File Documents Under Seal in Name Change Proceeding Under Address Confidentiality Program (Safe at Home)

Petition for Change of Gender and Issuance of New Birth Certificate

3/21/2019: Petition for Change of Gender and Issuance of New Birth Certificate

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Decree Changing Name; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Joseph Hong (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Joseph Hong (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Joseph Hong (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Petition for Change of Name; Filed by Joseph Hong (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Joseph Hong (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN QUANG VAN