Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:03:40 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF JONATHAN JOEL TORRES

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 IN THE MATTER OF JONATHAN JOEL TORRES was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0301

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TORRES JONATHAN JOEL

 

Court Documents

DECREE CHANGING NAME AND GENDER

10/27/2017: DECREE CHANGING NAME AND GENDER

PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME AND GENDER

7/19/2017: PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME AND GENDER

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME

7/19/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 44; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Decree; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DECREE CHANGING NAME AND GENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME AND GENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME

    Read MoreRead Less