Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2021 at 08:26:32 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: JOHN HENRY KELLEHER, JR

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 IN THE MATTER OF JOHN HENRY KELLEHER, JR was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0419

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KELLEHER JOHN HENRY JR

Defendant

: JOHN HENRY KELLEHER, JR

 

Court Documents

Decree Changing Name

3/24/2021: Decree Changing Name

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 03/24/2021

3/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 03/24/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 03/10/2021

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 03/10/2021

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

12/28/2020: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Proof of Publication

1/25/2021: Proof of Publication

Petition for Change of Name

12/28/2020: Petition for Change of Name

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by John Henry Kelleher, JR (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 03/24/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 03/10/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by John Henry Kelleher, JR (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by John Henry Kelleher, JR (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by John Henry Kelleher, JR (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by John Henry Kelleher, JR (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less