This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2020 at 11:02:55 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: JACK ANTHONY SIMIEN, III

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 IN THE MATTER OF JACK ANTHONY SIMIEN, III was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0077

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIMIEN JACK ANTHONY III

Defendant

: JACK ANTHONY SIMIEN, III

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/13/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME (CHANGE OF NAME) 2ND AMENDED

3/3/2020: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME (CHANGE OF NAME) 2ND AMENDED

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

2/13/2020: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) - (AMENDED)

2/19/2020: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) - (AMENDED)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION FOR NAME CHANGE

2/13/2020: Petition - PETITION FOR NAME CHANGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • Hearing06/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name) (2ND AMENDED); Filed by Jack Anthony Simien, III (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Jack Anthony Simien, III (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jack Anthony Simien, III (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Jack Anthony Simien, III (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPetition (for name change); Filed by Jack Anthony Simien, III (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.