This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2020 at 10:08:52 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: IN RE REAL PROPERTY: 13003 SOUTH COOKACRE AVE, COMPTON CA 90221

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 IN THE MATTER OF IN RE REAL PROPERTY 13003 SOUTH COOKACRE AVE, COMPTON CA 90221 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0607

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IN RE REAL PROPERTY: 13003 SOUTH COOKACRE AVE COMPTON CA 90221

Respondent

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CRUZ ROSA LINDA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Other - - WARRANT FOR ENTRY TO ABATE PUBLIC NUISANCE

2/14/2020: Other - - WARRANT FOR ENTRY TO ABATE PUBLIC NUISANCE

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/14/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Petition - PETITION WARRANT FOR ENTRY ONTO PRIVATE PROPERTY TO ABATE A PUBLIC NUISANCE

2/14/2020: Petition - PETITION WARRANT FOR ENTRY ONTO PRIVATE PROPERTY TO ABATE A PUBLIC NUISANCE

Order - (AMENDED)

2/27/2020: Order - (AMENDED)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Application - APPLICATION OF COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RETURN WARRANT FOR ENTRY ONTO PRIVATE PROPERTY TO ABATE A PUBLIC NUISANCE AND DECLARATION OF JAVIER MARTINEZ IN SUPPORT OF AP

2/26/2020: Application - APPLICATION OF COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO RETURN WARRANT FOR ENTRY ONTO PRIVATE PROPERTY TO ABATE A PUBLIC NUISANCE AND DECLARATION OF JAVIER MARTINEZ IN SUPPORT OF AP

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT RETURN OF AMENDED WARRANT FOR ENTRY TO ABATE PUBLIC NUISANCE TO ISSUING COURT

3/3/2020: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT RETURN OF AMENDED WARRANT FOR ENTRY TO ABATE PUBLIC NUISANCE TO ISSUING COURT

Petition - Petition warrant for entry onto private property to abate a public nuisance

2/14/2020: Petition - Petition warrant for entry onto private property to abate a public nuisance

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/14/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Other - - Warrant for Entry to Abate Public Nuisance

2/14/2020: Other - - Warrant for Entry to Abate Public Nuisance

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (return of warrant for entry to abate public nuisance) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (return of warrant for entry to abate public nuisance) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketAffidavit (Return Of Amended Warrant For Entry To Abate Public Nuisance To Issuing Court); Filed by County of Los Angeles (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAmended Warrant for Entry to Abate Public Nuisance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketApplication (of County of Los Angeles for Additional Time to Return Warrant for Entry onto Private Property to Abate a Public Nuisance and Declaration of Javier Martinez in Support of Application); Filed by In re real property: 13003 South Cookacre Ave, Compton Ca 90221 (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketWarrant for Entry to Abate Public Nuisance; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPetition (warrant for entry onto private property to abate a public nuisance); Filed by In re real property: 13003 South Cookacre Ave, Compton Ca 90221 (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by In re real property: 13003 South Cookacre Ave, Compton Ca 90221 (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRUZ ROSA LINDA