This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/07/2022 at 00:30:33 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN ELDER

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 IN THE MATTER OF GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN ELDER was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0266

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELDER GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN

Defendant

: GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN ELDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

UNGAR MICHAEL T.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

7/28/2022: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Petition for Change of Name

7/28/2022: Petition for Change of Name

Proof of Publication

9/8/2022: Proof of Publication

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [DECREE CHANGING NAME]

10/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [DECREE CHANGING NAME]

Decree Changing Name

10/6/2022: Decree Changing Name

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Petition for Change of Name: Filed By: GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN ELDER (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN ELDER (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Decree Changing Name]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M Held - Advanced and Heard on 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketName Change Criminal History Assessment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by: GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN ELDER (Petitioner); As to: GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN ELDER (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Name Change scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by: GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN ELDER (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN ELDER (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by: GHAZALEH BASHIRIAN ELDER (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer UNGAR MICHAEL T.