Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 16:54:40 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 IN THE MATTER OF FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3353

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Claimant

SMITH JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant and Petitioner Attorneys

LOURO JENNY ROSE

LOURO JENNY R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

2/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL CLAIMANT, JASON SMITHS DEPOSITION

3/3/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL CLAIMANT, JASON SMITHS DEPOSITION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

3/11/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice - NOTICE PETITIONER, FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL CLAIMANT, JASON SMITHS DEPOSITION AND TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

3/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE PETITIONER, FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL CLAIMANT, JASON SMITHS DEPOSITION AND TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR

Case Management Statement

10/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/22/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION PETITION OF FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY FOR SUPERIOR COURT CASE NUMBER FOR THE PURPOSES OF ISSUING DISCOVERY ORDERS PERTAINING TO UNDERINSURED MOTORIST MATTER;

10/13/2020: Petition - PETITION PETITION OF FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY FOR SUPERIOR COURT CASE NUMBER FOR THE PURPOSES OF ISSUING DISCOVERY ORDERS PERTAINING TO UNDERINSURED MOTORIST MATTER;

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

10/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • Hearing09/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (PETITIONER, FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL CLAIMANT, JASON SMITH?S DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (PETITIONER, FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY?S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL CLAIMANT, JASON SMITH?S DEPOSITION AND TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR); Filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (CLAIMANT, JASON SMITH?S DEPOSITION); Filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JASON SMITH (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketPetition (PETITION OF FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY FOR SUPERIOR COURT CASE NUMBER FOR THE PURPOSES OF ISSUING DISCOVERY ORDERS PERTAINING TO UNDERINSURED MOTORIST MATTER;); Filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOURO JENNY ROSE