Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 00:29:21 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: ETELVINA ORREGO

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 IN THE MATTER OF ETELVINA ORREGO was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEPHEN P. PFAHLER and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0092

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ORREGO ETELVINA AKA ETELVINA ORREGO PEREZ AKA ETELVINA LOPEZ

ORREGO ETELVINA AKA ETELVINA ORREGO PEREZ AKA ETELVINA LOPEZ AKA ELEVINA ORREGO LOPEZ

Defendant

: ETELVINA ORREGO

 

Court Documents

Decree Changing Name (Change of Name)

3/21/2019: Decree Changing Name (Change of Name)

Minute Order

5/21/2019: Minute Order

Order on Application to File Documents Under Seal in Name Change Proceeding Under Address Confidentiality Program (Safe at Home)

3/19/2019: Order on Application to File Documents Under Seal in Name Change Proceeding Under Address Confidentiality Program (Safe at Home)

Petition for Change of Gender and Issuance of New Birth Certificate

3/19/2019: Petition for Change of Gender and Issuance of New Birth Certificate

Unknown

3/19/2019: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/19/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Etelvina Orrego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Decree Changing Name; Filed by Etelvina Orrego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Etelvina Orrego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Etelvina Orrego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Petition for Change of Name; Filed by Etelvina Orrego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less