Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 12:38:25 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF ELZA ALIAN HAMZEHLOUI

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 IN THE MATTER OF ELZA ALIAN HAMZEHLOUI was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1720

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAMZEHLOUI ELZA ALIAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/12/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Legacy Document

7/12/2017: Legacy Document

Order on Application to File Documents Under Seal in Name Change Proceeding Under Address Confidentiality Program (Safe at Home)

7/12/2017: Order on Application to File Documents Under Seal in Name Change Proceeding Under Address Confidentiality Program (Safe at Home)

Proof of Publication

8/8/2017: Proof of Publication

Minute Order

8/25/2017: Minute Order

Legacy Document

8/25/2017: Legacy Document

Request For Copies

8/25/2017: Request For Copies

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change (Hrng On Petition To Change Name; Petition Granted) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Request For Copies; Filed by Elza Alian Hamzehloui (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-25 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Decree; Filed by Elza Alian Hamzehloui (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Elza Alian Hamzehloui (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Elza Alian Hamzehloui (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Elza Alian Hamzehloui (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Order to Show Cause; Filed by Elza Alian Hamzehloui (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Petition for Change of Name; Filed by Elza Alian Hamzehloui (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Elza Alian Hamzehloui (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less