This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2021 at 00:17:28 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 IN THE MATTER OF COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2085

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CRUZ ROSA LINDA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Return of Warrant) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Return Of Warrant For Entry To Abate Public Nuisance To Issuing Court); Filed by County of Los Angeles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketWarrant for Entry to Abate a Nuisance Existing on Private Property; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCounty of Los Angeles Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Application for Warrant for Entry Onto Private Property to Abate a Public Nuisance; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPetition (warrant for entry onto private property to abate a public nuisance); Filed by County of Los Angeles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRUZ ROSA LINDA