Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 09:41:27 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: CHUNG HSI HSU

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 IN THE MATTER OF CHUNG HSI HSU was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2727

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HSU CHUNG HSI

HSU CHUNG HSI AKA ROGER CHUNGHSI HSU

Defendant

: CHUNG HSI HSU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HSU ROGER C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Decree Changing Name

2/9/2021: Decree Changing Name

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 02/09/2021

2/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 02/09/2021

Proof of Publication

10/29/2020: Proof of Publication

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

12/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 12/17/2020

12/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 12/17/2020

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/18/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Petition for Change of Name

8/24/2020: Petition for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

8/24/2020: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by Chung Hsi Hsu (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 02/09/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 12/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Chung Hsi Hsu (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Chung Hsi Hsu (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Chung Hsi Hsu (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by Chung Hsi Hsu (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP02727    Hearing Date: February 09, 2021    Dept: 74

20STCP02727 IN THE MATTER OF: CHUNG HSI HSU

NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. The petition will be granted. A copy of the signed decree will be available in Room 112 of the Clerk's Office seven days after the date of the hearing.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU ROGER C.