Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2021 at 01:17:25 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: CHRISTOPHER TA

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 IN THE MATTER OF CHRISTOPHER TA was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0369

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

TA CHRISTOPHER

TA CHRISTOPHER AKA HOANG VU TA

Defendant

: CHRISTOPHER TA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

1/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Decree Changing Name

1/21/2021: Decree Changing Name

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 01/21/2021

1/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 01/21/2021

Proof of Publication

12/4/2020: Proof of Publication

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by Christopher Ta (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 01/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Christopher Ta (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Christopher Ta (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Christopher Ta (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketPetition (for name change); Filed by Christopher Ta (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less