This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2020 at 02:44:27 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: CHLOE MELROSE HIRTENSTEIN

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 IN THE MATTER OF CHLOE MELROSE HIRTENSTEIN was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0282

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HIRTENSTEIN CHLOE MELROSE AKA CHLOE MELROSE

Defendant

: CHLOE MELROSE HIRTENSTEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HAKIMI HELGA

BERKE JEFF

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

8/19/2020: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Petition for Change of Name

8/19/2020: Petition for Change of Name

Proof of Publication

9/17/2020: Proof of Publication

Decree Changing Name

10/23/2020: Decree Changing Name

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

10/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department K; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by Helga Hakimi (Attorney); Chloe Melrose Hirtenstein (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Chloe Melrose Hirtenstein (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Helga Hakimi (Attorney); Chloe Melrose Hirtenstein (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Helga Hakimi (Attorney); Chloe Melrose Hirtenstein (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by Helga Hakimi (Attorney); Chloe Melrose Hirtenstein (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less