Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2020 at 02:44:27 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: CHLOE MELROSE HIRTENSTEIN

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 IN THE MATTER OF CHLOE MELROSE HIRTENSTEIN was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0282

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HIRTENSTEIN CHLOE MELROSE

HIRTENSTEIN CHLOE MELROSE AKA CHLOE MELROSE

Defendant

: CHLOE MELROSE HIRTENSTEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HAKIMI HELGA

BERKE JEFF

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

10/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Decree Changing Name

10/23/2020: Decree Changing Name

Proof of Publication

9/17/2020: Proof of Publication

Petition for Change of Name

8/19/2020: Petition for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

8/19/2020: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department K; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by Helga Hakimi (Attorney); Chloe Melrose Hirtenstein (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Chloe Melrose Hirtenstein (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Helga Hakimi (Attorney); Chloe Melrose Hirtenstein (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Helga Hakimi (Attorney); Chloe Melrose Hirtenstein (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by Helga Hakimi (Attorney); Chloe Melrose Hirtenstein (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAKIMI HELGA