This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 07:46:21 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: BEATRICE FAXON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 IN THE MATTER OF BEATRICE FAXON, was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0712

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Interested Party

GADD MEAGHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EHRENREICH ROBERT M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

12/30/2021: Petition - PETITION PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM FOR MINOR

1/5/2022: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM FOR MINOR

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

12/30/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR AC...)

2/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR AC...)

Order - ORDER ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM FOR MINOR

2/1/2022: Order - ORDER ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM FOR MINOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReSubmission of Proposed Order) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Petition (for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Ac...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketOrder (on Petition for Approval of Compromise of Claim for Minor); Filed by Beatrice Faxon (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition (for Approval of Compromise of Claim for Minor); Filed by Beatrice Faxon (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Beatrice Faxon (Petitioner); Meaghan Gadd (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketPetition (for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability); Filed by Beatrice Faxon (Petitioner); Meaghan Gadd (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Beatrice Faxon (Petitioner); Meaghan Gadd (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0712 Hearing Date: February 1, 2022 Dept: P

Tentative Ruling

In the Matter of Beatrice Faxon et al., Case No. *******0712

Hearing Date February 1, 2022

Petition for Approval of Compromise of Claim for Minor (UNOPPOSED)

Any proposed compromise of a minor’s claim by a guardian ad litem must receive court approval before it is effective. Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. 372(a).

Meghan Gadd, the parent and guardian ad litem for minor claimant Beatrice Faxon, moves to settle a pending personal injury claim for $140,000. The petition is accompanied by a report from Dr. Karamanoukian explaining the nature of the injury and further required treatment. The petition also provides for a structured settlement payout for the minor. GRANTED.

DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC PARTIES AND COUNSEL ARE ENCOURAGED TO APPEAR BY MICROSOFT OFFICE TEAMS.