This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2020 at 22:56:04 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: ALBERTA LOUISE MATHES

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 IN THE MATTER OF ALBERTA LOUISE MATHES was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4348

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MATHES ALBERTA LOUISE

Defendant

: ALBERTA LOUISE MATHES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHAMBERS MICHELLE A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

10/7/2019: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Petition for Change of Name

10/7/2019: Petition for Change of Name

Proof of Publication

11/1/2019: Proof of Publication

Decree Changing Name

12/10/2019: Decree Changing Name

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by ALBERTA LOUISE MATHES (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by ALBERTA LOUISE MATHES (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ALBERTA LOUISE MATHES (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by ALBERTA LOUISE MATHES (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by ALBERTA LOUISE MATHES (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******4348    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: 44

No appearance is necessary. The petition will be GRANTED. Petitioner can obtain a copy of the signed decree one week from 12/10/19 at the certification window in Room 112.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMBERS MICHELLE ANN