This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 16:43:53 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: ADAN JOEL GARCIA

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 IN THE MATTER OF ADAN JOEL GARCIA was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0454

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

GARCIA ADAN JOEL

GARCIA ADAN JOEL AKA ADAM JOEL GARCIA

Defendant

: ADAN JOEL GARCIA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication

1/23/2020: Proof of Publication

Decree Changing Name

3/4/2020: Decree Changing Name

Petition for Change of Name

12/5/2019: Petition for Change of Name

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/5/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

2/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 02/05/2020

2/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE) OF 02/05/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

3/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: NAME CHANGE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDecree Changing Name; Filed by Adan Joel Garcia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change) of 02/05/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Adan Joel Garcia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPetition for Change of Name; Filed by Adan Joel Garcia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Adan Joel Garcia (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

    Read MoreRead Less