This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 02:33:04 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF 9304 KALMIA STREET, LOS ANGELES CA 90002

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 IN THE MATTER OF 9304 KALMIA STREET, LOS ANGELES CA 90002 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN S. CURREY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0439

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN S. CURREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN PROGRESSIVE LLC

Claimants

MCTYER TANGANYIKA

MILES LATONYA

MILES LONEL

MILES ARCHIE

MILES-SUTTON NIKITA

MILES WANDA

MILES WALLACE L.

MILES GILBERT

MILES-HILLYER RUBYE

MILES-MCNAIR NYLYNN

Respondent

MILES LINDA F.

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETIPRIN BENJAMIN D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Case dismissed/disposed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (1) CONFIRMATION OF DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS AS DIRECTED IN 6/28/17 ORDER;.2) DISMISSAL OF THE CASE;) - Case dismissed/disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Case dismissed/disposed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (1) CONFIRMATION OF DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS AS DIRECTED IN 6/28/17 ORDER;.2) DISMISSAL OF THE CASE;) - Case dismissed/disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address (PETITIONER TANGANYIKA McTYER CHANGES HER ADDRESS TO: 1200 S. TEMPLE AVE., COMPTON CA. 90221 ); Filed by Attorney for Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by TANGANYIKA McTYER (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Non-Appearance (Case Review) (1) CONFIRMATION OF DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUNDS AS DIRECTED IN 6/28/17 ORDER;.2) DISMISSAL OF THE CASE;) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A; Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court Makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department A, Brian S. Currey, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter - Court Makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2017
  • Notice; Filed by WESTERN PROGRESSIVE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Notice (OF HEARING ON PETITION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON PETITION WESTERN PROGRESSIVE, LLC'S REQUEST TO DEPOSIT UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE WITH THE COURT; ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Notice; Filed by WESTERN PROGRESSIVE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Order (ORDER ON PETITIONER WESTERN PROGRESSIVE, LLC'S REQUEST TO DEPOSIT UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE WITH THE COURT ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by WESTERN PROGRESSIVE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Proof of Services by Mail (TO ALL POTENTIAL CLAIMANTS OF PETITION & DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS & DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by WESTERN PROGRESSIVE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less