Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2019 at 01:51:53 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF 741 LOYOLA AVENUE, CARSON CA 90746

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 IN THE MATTER OF 741 LOYOLA AVENUE, CARSON CA 90746 was filed as a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1159

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

Claimants

WILLIS CLARENCE EARL

WILLIS JOSHUA EARL

FOWLER BOBBY

Defendants

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS AFTER

AFTER ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COUTTS MELISSA ROBBINS

Claimant Attorneys

SHERRON CLAUDINE LUCETTE

SCHACHTER ROBERT BAILEY

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL

2/11/2019: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

2/20/2019: RETURNED MAIL

Order - ORDER REVISED ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

3/28/2019: Order - ORDER REVISED ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS ON DEPOSIT

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re Receipt of Proposed Order re Di...)

2/27/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re Receipt of Proposed Order re Di...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re Receipt of Proposed Order re Di...) of 02/27/2019

2/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re Receipt of Proposed Order re Di...) of 02/27/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Judgment; Non-Appearance Case Review ...)

2/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Judgment; Non-Appearance Case Review ...)

Declaration - Declaration of Robert Schachter re Submission of Order

2/6/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Robert Schachter re Submission of Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other to Determine Disbursement of Surplus Funds on...)

1/29/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other to Determine Disbursement of Surplus Funds on...)

Declaration - Declaration of Robert Schachter, Statement of Facts and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Claim

1/24/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Robert Schachter, Statement of Facts and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Claim

Notice - Notice of Claim

12/21/2018: Notice - Notice of Claim

RETURNED MAIL

12/11/2018: RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

12/13/2018: RETURNED MAIL

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/28/2018

11/28/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/28/2018

RETURNED MAIL

12/10/2018: RETURNED MAIL

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

11/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Legacy Document -

10/3/2018: Legacy Document -

Legacy Document -

10/3/2018: Legacy Document -

Legacy Document -

10/3/2018: Legacy Document -

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketOrder (Revised Order for Distribution of Funds on Deposit); Filed by Bobby Fowler (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Receipt of New Proposed Order for Distribution of Funds on Deposit)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re Receipt of Proposed Order re Distribution of Surplus Funds) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re Receipt of Proposed Order re Di...) of 02/27/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Receipt of Proposed Order re Di...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re Receipt of Proposed Order re Distribution of Surplus Funds) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/28/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Joshua Earl Willis' Claim of Surplus Funds; Filed by Joshua Earl Willis (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Clarence Earl Willis' Claim of Surplus Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order to Deposit Surplus Funds 'Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Code 2924j(c)&(d); Filed by QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHACHTER ROBERT BAILEY