This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2022 at 09:43:12 (UTC).

IN TAE KIM VS LAW ANGELES, A.P.C., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 IN TAE KIM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAW ANGELES, A P C , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7988

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM IN TAE

Defendants

AWA NNANA

LAW ANGELES A.P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE ESQ. MARY

Defendant Attorney

YEE ESQ. STEVEN R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling

10/26/2022: Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

10/13/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

10/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 10/13/2022

10/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 10/13/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) AGAINST JUDGE YOLANDA OROZCO

10/12/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) AGAINST JUDGE YOLANDA OROZCO

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

10/12/2022: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT 31) OF 09/19/2022

9/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT 31) OF 09/19/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT 31)

9/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT 31)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/6/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

9/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) OF 09/09/2022

9/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...) OF 09/09/2022

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

8/29/2022: Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint filed by Defendants on 10-12-2022;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Portions of Complaint filed by Defendants on 10-12-2022;: Name Extension: Portions of Complaint filed by Defendants on 10-12-2022;; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint filed by Defendants on 10-12-2022; scheduled for 04/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Steven R. Yee, Esq. (Attorney): Last Name changed from Yee to Yee, Esq. Middle Name changed from Robert to R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketAddress for Steven R. Yee, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Mary Lee, Esq. (Attorney): Last Name changed from Lee to Lee, Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: IN TAE KIM (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Malcolm Mackey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: IN TAE KIM (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: IN TAE KIM (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: IN TAE KIM (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: IN TAE KIM (Plaintiff); As to: Law Angeles, A.P.C., a California corporation (Defendant); NNANA AWA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less