This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2023 at 06:12:39 (UTC).

IN SONG VS ENVIRON PHASE CONSULTING CO.,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 IN SONG filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ENVIRON PHASE CONSULTING CO ,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5042

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SONG IN

Defendants

ENVIRO DEVELOPMENT INC.

ENVIRON PHASE CONSULTING CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIGGINS CHAD

Defendant Attorney

PARK DANIEL E.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/15/2022

12/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/15/2022

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/5/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Case Management Statement

12/6/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

10/5/2022: Answer

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/5/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Complaint

8/3/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/3/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/3/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/3/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • Hearing05/24/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Environ Phase Consulting Co. for failure to serve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • Hearing05/24/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Environ Phase Consulting Co. for failure to serve scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/24/2023 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketAddress for Chad Biggins (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 72 - Hon. Curtis A. Kin; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Enviro Development Inc. (Defendant), Environ Phase Consulting Co., (Defendant) to Enviro Development Inc. (Defendant), Environ Phase Consulting Co. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: In Song (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Richard L. Fruin, Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: In Song (Plaintiff); As to: Environ Phase Consulting Co., (Defendant); Enviro Development Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard L. Fruin in Department 15 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: In Song (Plaintiff); As to: Environ Phase Consulting Co., (Defendant); Enviro Development Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: In Song (Plaintiff); As to: Environ Phase Consulting Co., (Defendant); Enviro Development Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less