Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2018 at 11:34:17 (UTC).

IN RE JOSE MORALES

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 IN RE JOSE MORALES was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1501

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

P.F.M.G.G. LLC

Defendant

JOSE MORALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHAFFER JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/22/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

12/12/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

PROOF OF SERVICE RE NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE ON ATTORNEY GENERAL

12/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE RE NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE ON ATTORNEY GENERAL

PROOF OF SERVICE RE NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS ON INTERESTED PARTIES

12/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE RE NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS ON INTERESTED PARTIES

PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

11/13/2017: PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

DECLARATION OF JOSE MORALES IN SUPPORT OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

11/13/2017: DECLARATION OF JOSE MORALES IN SUPPORT OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (Petition only ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • at 08:33 am in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Civil Petition Hearing (FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OFSTRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENTRIGHTS) - Not held-No appearances

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Notice (OF HEARING ` ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAFFERY JOHN ESQ.