Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2020 at 07:46:50 (UTC).

IN RE BLOCKED ACCOUNT OF SASHA PEARL PATTON

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 IN RE BLOCKED ACCOUNT OF SASHA PEARL PATTON was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3816

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PATTON CHRISTOPHER S

Defendant

BLOCKED ACCOUNT OF SASHA PEARL PATTON

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte - Application - re: Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account

5/29/2020: Ex Parte - Application - re: Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account

Minute Order

5/29/2020: Minute Order

Petition - Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account

4/29/2020: Petition - Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/29/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (re: Withdrawal of Funds from Blocked Account ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Withdrawal of Funds From Blocked Account; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less