This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2021 at 22:15:01 (UTC).

IN HOON CHOI, ET AL. VS FILIPPO MARCHINO

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 IN HOON CHOI filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FILIPPO MARCHINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3913

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHOI HANNAH

CHOI IN HOON

Defendant

MARCHINO FILIPPO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN RICHARD D.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

9/17/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/4/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2023
  • Hearing09/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • Hearing03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Hearing02/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by In Hoon Choi (Plaintiff); Hannah Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by In Hoon Choi (Plaintiff); Hannah Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by In Hoon Choi (Plaintiff); Hannah Choi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOFFMAN RICHARD D.