This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 12:20:12 (UTC).

IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC, ET AL. VS KASRA S. TORABI

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 IN HIS PRESENCE, LLC, filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against KASRA S TORABI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are VALERIE SALKIN, BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA and THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2182

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

VALERIE SALKIN

BERNIE C. LAFORTEZA

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

16717 VANOWEN LLC

KHOSRAVIZADEH MARIYAN

23830 HATTERAS LLC

IN HIS PRESENCE LLC

MARIYAN CONSULTING INC.

6843 ZELZAH LLC

Defendant

TORABI KASRA S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THIEL ADAM

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 11/30/2020

11/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 11/30/2020

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/1/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

11/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Complaint

3/26/2020: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/17/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED

12/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/26/2021, MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)]

8/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/26/2021, MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/26/2021

8/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/07/2021

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/07/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 02/05/2021

2/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 02/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

2/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Answer

12/14/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/18/2020

9/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/18/2020

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • Hearing01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 01/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U updated: Result Date to 07/25/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/25/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department U - Hon. Valerie Salkineffective 01/10/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of case reassignment with proof of service attached; Filed by: In His Presence, LLC (Plaintiff); Mariyan Consulting, Inc. (Plaintiff); 23830 Hatteras, LLC (Plaintiff); 16717 Vanowen, LLC (Plaintiff); 6843 Zelzah, LLC (Plaintiff); Mariyan Khosravizadeh (Plaintiff); As to: In His Presence, LLC (Plaintiff); Mariyan Consulting, Inc. (Plaintiff); 23830 Hatteras, LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 08/17/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/18/2020 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: In His Presence, LLC (Plaintiff); Mariyan Consulting, Inc. (Plaintiff); 23830 Hatteras, LLC (Plaintiff); 16717 Vanowen, LLC (Plaintiff); 6843 Zelzah, LLC (Plaintiff); Mariyan Khosravizadeh (Plaintiff); As to: Kasra S. Torabi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: In His Presence, LLC (Plaintiff); Mariyan Consulting, Inc. (Plaintiff); 23830 Hatteras, LLC (Plaintiff); 16717 Vanowen, LLC (Plaintiff); 6843 Zelzah, LLC (Plaintiff); Mariyan Khosravizadeh (Plaintiff); As to: Kasra S. Torabi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: In His Presence, LLC (Plaintiff); Mariyan Consulting, Inc. (Plaintiff); 23830 Hatteras, LLC (Plaintiff); 16717 Vanowen, LLC (Plaintiff); 6843 Zelzah, LLC (Plaintiff); Mariyan Khosravizadeh (Plaintiff); As to: Kasra S. Torabi (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IN HIS PRESENCE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; is a litigant