This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/30/2019 at 00:30:02 (UTC).

IMP RENAISSANCE LLC VS 4MY2C, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 IMP RENAISSANCE LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against 4MY2C, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9521

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMP RENAISSANCE LLC

Defendants

4MY2C INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

YOJIE SHABU SHABU JAPANESE HEALTHY DINING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

YOJIE SHABU SHABU JAPANESE HEALTHY DINING INC.

4MY2C INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RICHARDSON DESS

COUGHLIN FRANK J.

Defendant Attorneys

NACIONALES-TAFOYA ROBERT MANUEL

NACIONALES-TAFOYA ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

10/17/2019: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 10/18/2019

10/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 10/18/2019

Proof of Service by Mail

5/8/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

5/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/17/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

4/2/2019: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/20/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/20/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (YOJIE SHABU SHABU JAPANESE HEALTHY DINING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

3/22/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (YOJIE SHABU SHABU JAPANESE HEALTHY DINING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/22/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (4MY2C, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

3/22/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (4MY2C, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • Hearing07/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Bankruptcy of Yohle Shabu Shabu Japanese Healthy Dining

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((one day)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 10/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by 4MY2C, Inc. (Defendant); Yojie Shabu Shabu Japanese Healthy Dining, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 4MY2C, Inc. (Defendant); Yojie Shabu Shabu Japanese Healthy Dining, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by IMP Renaissance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by IMP Renaissance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 4MY2C, Inc. (Defendant); Yojie Shabu Shabu Japanese Healthy Dining, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((YOJIE SHABU SHABU JAPANESE HEALTHY DINING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((4MY2C, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IMP Renaissance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by IMP Renaissance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by IMP Renaissance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yojie Shabu Shabu Japanese Healthy Dining, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where IMP RENAISSANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coughlin, Frank J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARDSON DESS