This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2023 at 05:45:15 (UTC).

IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL LLC VS WEI-PO CHANG

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WEI-PO CHANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8915

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL LLC

Defendant

CHANG WEI-PO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDVEI SEBASTIAN M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LIN MONICA H.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

2/6/2018: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT

2/6/2018: JUDGMENT

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order - -

3/12/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order - -

Minute Order - -

1/19/2018: Minute Order - -

Minute Order - -

2/6/2018: Minute Order - -

Minute Order -

2/6/2018: Minute Order -

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

2/7/2018: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE RELATED AND TRANSFERRED TO CCW; DECLARATION OF SEBASTIAN M. MEDVEI

2/14/2018: RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE WHY CASES SHOULD NOT BE RELATED AND TRANSFERRED TO CCW; DECLARATION OF SEBASTIAN M. MEDVEI

Minute Order -

2/22/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order - -

2/22/2018: Minute Order - -

Minute Order - -

2/28/2018: Minute Order - -

Notice of Motion - -NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC, FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF SEBASTIAN M. MEDVEI

4/6/2018: Notice of Motion - -NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC, FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF SEBASTIAN M. MEDVEI

Minute Order -

5/31/2018: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/11/2018: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/16/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

1/19/2018: Minute Order -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

1/23/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

11/27/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDocument:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Ruling on Submitted Matter William F. Highberger 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-11 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-31 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Motion for Attorney Fees William F. Highberger 3:00 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Motion for Attorney Fees 05/31/18 at 3:00 pm William F. Highberger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketDocument:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-02-28 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Order to Show Cause Debre Katz Weintraub 9:50 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Order to Show Cause 02/22/18 at 9:00 am Debre Katz Weintraub

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketDocument:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketDocument:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Conference-Case Management 02/06/18 at 8:30 am Gail Ruderman Feuer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Other Intentional Tort-notPI/WD/PD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less