This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 04:38:29 (UTC).

IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS MARY SANDOVAL-MORGAN

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARY SANDOVAL-MORGAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7513

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

SANDOVAL-MORGAN MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDVEI SEBASTIAN

Defendant Attorney

GERGES MOTAZ M

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/24/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/24/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/24/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/24/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

10/14/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2023
  • Hearing12/13/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2023
  • Hearing12/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 07/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2023 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50 updated: Result Date to 01/09/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Immigrant Rights Defense Council, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Immigrant Rights Defense Council, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Sandoval-Morgan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Immigrant Rights Defense Council, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Sandoval-Morgan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Immigrant Rights Defense Council, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Sandoval-Morgan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet in Department 50 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERGES MOTAZ M