This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/06/2022 at 14:23:04 (UTC).

IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS JORGE PERALTA

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL, LLC , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JORGE PERALTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7873

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

PERALTA JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDVEI SEBASTIAN

Defendant Attorney

WHITE GRACE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/26/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/26/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/8/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

10/13/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; Filed by: Jorge Peralta (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAddress for Sebastian Medvei (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Immigrant Rights Defense Council, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Peralta (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Immigrant Rights Defense Council, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Peralta (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Immigrant Rights Defense Council, LLC., a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Peralta (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 26 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMMIGRANT RIGHTS DEFENSE COUNCIL LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant