Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2021 at 03:14:22 (UTC).

IMELDA GALAN CARRILLO VS LEONARDO APARTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 IMELDA GALAN CARRILLO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LEONARDO APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0651

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRILLO IMELDA GALAN

Defendants

LEONARDO APARTMENTS

LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...) OF 12/11/2020

12/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...) OF 12/11/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

12/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/17/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/13/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

8/13/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDismissal Failure to Serve Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal Failure to Serve Com...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal Failure to Serve Com...) of 01/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...) of 12/11/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Imelda Galan Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Imelda Galan Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Imelda Galan Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEONARDO APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O