This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 21:22:18 (UTC).

IMAHRY CRIM VS LINDSEY TAYLOR HOWE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 IMAHRY CRIM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LINDSEY TAYLOR HOWE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6626

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRIM IMAHRY

Defendants

HOWE GARY JR.

HOWE LINDSEY TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM EDWARD S.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/23/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/23/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/23/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/23/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

5/17/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/17/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

5/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/19/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Imahry Crim on 02/23/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Imahry Crim as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Imahry Crim (Plaintiff); As to: Lindsey Taylor Howe (Defendant); Gary Howe, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Imahry Crim (Plaintiff); As to: Gary Howe, Jr. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/09/2022; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Imahry Crim (Plaintiff); As to: Lindsey Taylor Howe (Defendant); Service Date: 05/07/2022; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Imahry Crim (Plaintiff); As to: Lindsey Taylor Howe (Defendant); Gary Howe, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/19/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Imahry Crim (Plaintiff); As to: Lindsey Taylor Howe (Defendant); Gary Howe, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Imahry Crim (Plaintiff); As to: Lindsey Taylor Howe (Defendant); Gary Howe, Jr. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less